HI SCR94 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Retail Stores And Pharmacies Doing Business In The State To Adopt A Policy On A National And Local Level Guaranteeing An Individual's Unhindered Access To All United States Food And Drug Administration-approved Contraceptives.
Title
Urging Retail Stores And Pharmacies Doing Business In The State To Adopt A Policy On A National And Local Level Guaranteeing An Individual's Unhindered Access To All United States Food And Drug Administration-approved Contraceptives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 815). |
2023-04-17 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-17 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2). |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2223), recommending adoption. |
2023-04-14 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. |
2023-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 04-14-23 11:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 28 |
2023-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 599) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-23. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPN/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1693) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-23 10:14AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPN/HHS. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR159 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Referred to HLT, referral sheet 20
SR87 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Referred to CPN/HHS.
SR87 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Referred to CPN/HHS.