HI SCR92 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR92
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Submit A Report On Unutilized, Lapsed Federal Grant Revenue For Public Education.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Submit A Report On Unutilized, Lapsed Federal Grant Revenue For Public Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2040-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ing, McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2018-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 04-13-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 524). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3504) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kidani. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-27-18 11:05AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3109), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kim. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR92 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - Referred to TRE/WTL/PSM, WAM.