HI SCR87 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR87

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting State Legislators To Utilize Uniform Procedures For The Custody, Inventory, And Care Of Protocol Gifts Received On Behalf Of The State Or Either House Of The Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting State Legislators To Utilize Uniform Procedures For The Custody, Inventory, And Care Of Protocol Gifts Received On Behalf Of The State Or Either House Of The Legislature.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/LCA deferred the measure until 03-17-20 3:30PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to GVO/LCA.
2020-03-05SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR87 (Carry Over) 2019-03-12 - Referred to CPH.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback