HI SCR86 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR86

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 52
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Governor To Recognize And Commemorate August 26, 2020, As Women's Equality Day, Celebrating The Centennial Of, And Honoring Hawaii's Role In, The Women's Suffrage Movement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Governor To Recognize And Commemorate August 26, 2020, As Women's Equality Day, Celebrating The Centennial Of, And Honoring Hawaii's Role In, The Women's Suffrage Movement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 52
2020-06-30HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 551) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-06-30SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2020-06-29SenateOne Day Notice 06-30-20.
2020-06-29SenateReported from GVO/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3702) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2020-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to GVO/LCA.
2020-03-05SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR86 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback