HI SCR85 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR85

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The University Of Hawaii To Include Community College Students Within The Assignment Priorities For Student Housing Services On Four-year Campuses That Offer Student Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The University Of Hawaii To Include Community College Students Within The Assignment Priorities For Student Housing Services On Four-year Campuses That Offer Student Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:50PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to HRE.
2020-03-03SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR85 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - Re-Referred to CPH.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback