HI SCR84 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR84
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Re-Referred to HRE/EDU.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Re-Referred to HRE/EDU.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Resources Development, University Of Hawaii, And Department Of Education To Convene A Task Force To Identify And Create A Consistent Method For Streamlining Job Postings For Positions Within The University Of Hawaii And Department Of Education.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Resources Development, University Of Hawaii, And Department Of Education To Convene A Task Force To Identify And Create A Consistent Method For Streamlining Job Postings For Positions Within The University Of Hawaii And Department Of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE/EDU. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HRE/EDU. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR84 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Department of Education
Department of Human Resources Development
Job Postings
Task Force
University of Hawaii
Department of Human Resources Development
Job Postings
Task Force
University of Hawaii
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=84&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR84_.HTM |