HI SCR81 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR81

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Agriculture, In Collaboration With University Of Hawaii Economic Research Organization, To Conduct An Economic Impact Study To Assess The Impact Of Potential Changes To Coffee Labeling Requirements On The Local Coffee Industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Agriculture, In Collaboration With University Of Hawaii Economic Research Organization, To Conduct An Economic Impact Study To Assess The Impact Of Potential Changes To Coffee Labeling Requirements On The Local Coffee Industry.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-20 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to AEN/HRE.
2020-03-03SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR81 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback