HI SCR81 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting All Public Elementary, Intermediate, And Middle Schools In The State To Participate In The Safe Routes To School Program Established Pursuant To Section 291c-3, Hawaii Revised Statutes, For Keiki Health Benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting All Public Elementary, Intermediate, And Middle Schools In The State To Participate In The Safe Routes To School Program Established Pursuant To Section 291c-3, Hawaii Revised Statutes, For Keiki Health Benefits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from LHE/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2222), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-11HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ward.
2019-04-11HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Quinlan; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Tokioka.
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-11-19 11:31AM in conference room 329.
2019-04-10HouseThe committee(s) on LHE/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-11-19 at 11:31am.
2019-04-08HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LHE/HLT on Wednesday, 04-10-19 2:01PM in conference room 309.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to LHE/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1824) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1626), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback