HI SCR81 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR81
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Working Group To Examine How The Department Of Education Can Maximize Medicaid Reimbursement For Support Services Offered To Eligible Students During School Hours.
Title
Requesting The Establishment Of A Working Group To Examine How The Department Of Education Can Maximize Medicaid Reimbursement For Support Services Offered To Eligible Students During School Hours.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-27-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-27-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-24-18 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 829). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 640). |
2018-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-23 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, Hashem, Say excused (3). |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2071-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-19-18 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2044-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ing, McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2018-04-12 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 04-13-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-12 | House | Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 56 |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to EDN/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 518) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3508) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 4:00PM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from EDU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3297), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Dela Cruz. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HMS, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR81 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HCR101 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to EDN/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR101 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to EDN/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39