HI SCR80 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR80
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Examine And Provide A Safe Way For Pedestrians To Cross Hawaii Belt Road.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Examine And Provide A Safe Way For Pedestrians To Cross Hawaii Belt Road.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to TRS. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR80 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - Re-Referred to CPH.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=80&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR80_.HTM |