HI SCR79 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging State Entities To Give Consideration To Applicants Who Work Within Twenty-five Miles Of The Housing Applied For Under Affordable, Reserved, And Workforce Housing Programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging State Entities To Give Consideration To Applicants Who Work Within Twenty-five Miles Of The Housing Applied For Under Affordable, Reserved, And Workforce Housing Programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from GVO/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1583), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-22SenateRe-Referred to GVO/HOU, WAM.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to GVO/HOU/LCA, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback