HI SCR78 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR78

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 52
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Study The Feasibility Of Using Recycled Plastic To Repair Roadways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Study The Feasibility Of Using Recycled Plastic To Repair Roadways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 52
2020-06-30HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 550).
2020-06-30SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2020-06-29SenateOne Day Notice 06-30-20.
2020-06-29SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3700) with recommendation of adoption.
2020-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to TRS.
2020-03-03SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR78 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback