HI SCR75 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR75
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Planning To Convene An Interdisciplinary Task Force To Develop A Framework For A Sea Level Adaptation And Resilience Plan For The Waikiki District.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Planning To Convene An Interdisciplinary Task Force To Develop A Framework For A Sea Level Adaptation And Resilience Plan For The Waikiki District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 511) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1472) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 1:05PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR75 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32