HI SCR75 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing The Amendment Of A Lease Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Piers 24 To 26, Identified As "lot 12", In Honolulu Harbor, Oahu, For Pacific Shipyards International.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The Amendment Of A Lease Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Piers 24 To 26, Identified As "lot 12", In Honolulu Harbor, Oahu, For Pacific Shipyards International.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 606).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1823) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1599), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:50PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR112 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback