HI SCR75 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The University Of Hawaii At Manoa Department Of Kinesiology And Rehabilitation Science Convene A Working Group To Develop An Implementation Strategy To Require Youth Sports Organizations To Initiate And Implement Concussion Management Plans.
Title
Concussions; Youth Sports; Concussion Management Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1227), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kidani, Wakai. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to HEA, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |