HI SCR74 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging The Department Of Education And Other Agency And Community Stakeholders To Continue Meeting As A Working Group For Sexual Violence Prevention Education In Public Schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging The Department Of Education And Other Agency And Community Stakeholders To Continue Meeting As A Working Group For Sexual Violence Prevention Education In Public Schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2249) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD.
2019-04-11HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Tokioka.
2019-04-08HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 04-11-19 9:15AM in conference room 329.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 605).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1804) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to JDC.
2019-03-27SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1624), with recommendation of referral to JDC.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to EDU, JDC.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback