HI SCR74 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Invasive Species Council To Develop And Implement A Comprehensive Interagency Plan For The Control And Eradication Of Albizia Throughout The State; Starting With The Island Of Hawaii, And To Partner To Utilize Albizia Trees That Are Removed And Urging The Department Of Agriculture To Investigate Biocontrol Agents For The Control Of Albizia.
Title
Department of Agriculture; Invasive Species Council; Noxious Weeds; Albizia
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported from AGR/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1730), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-04-19 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Hanohano, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Evans, Kawakami. |
2013-04-19 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Choy, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Cheape, Ward. |
2013-04-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/EEP on Friday, 04-19-13 8:45AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 633) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1451) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1128), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 3:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=74&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR74_.HTM |