HI SCR71 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR71

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation To Convene A Task Force To Conduct A Feasibility Study For Construction Of A Hospital In North Kona.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation To Convene A Task Force To Conduct A Feasibility Study For Construction Of A Hospital In North Kona.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to CPH.
2020-03-03SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR71 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 50

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback