HI SCR70 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR70

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Hawaii State Commission On The Status Of Women To Convene A Task Force To Conduct A Study On Missing And Murdered Native Hawaiian Women And Girls And To Submit A Report On The Study To The Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Hawaii State Commission On The Status Of Women To Convene A Task Force To Conduct A Study On Missing And Murdered Native Hawaiian Women And Girls And To Submit A Report On The Study To The Legislature.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on HMS/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-20 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to HMS/HWN, JDC .
2020-03-03SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR70 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback