HI SCR70 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The Right Of Hawaii's Farmers To Sell Their Locally Grown Produce Free Of Duplicative And Unnecessary State And Local Rules And Regulations.
Title
Agriculture; Farmers; Food Safety Rules and Regulations
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee on AGL deferred the measure. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to AGL, JDL. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=70&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR70_.HTM |