HI SCR69 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR69
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Every Commercial Or Public Building Located On Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands Trust Land To Display A Work Of Art Commemorating Prince Jonah Kuhio Kalanianaole And A Description Of His Achievements.
Title
Requesting Every Commercial Or Public Building Located On Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands Trust Land To Display A Work Of Art Commemorating Prince Jonah Kuhio Kalanianaole And A Description Of His Achievements.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2260), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 49 |
2019-04-02 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 552) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-02-19. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1672) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:18PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HWN/CPH. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR69 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
HCR71 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR71 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33