HI SCR63 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 47
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Real Estate Commission To Conduct A Study On The Implementation Of Recommendations Found In The Condominium Governance An Examination Of Some Issues 1989 Report By The Legislative Reference Bureau.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Real Estate Commission To Conduct A Study On The Implementation Of Recommendations Found In The Condominium Governance An Examination Of Some Issues 1989 Report By The Legislative Reference Bureau.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 47
2019-03-29HouseReceived notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 540).
2019-03-29SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-29-19.
2019-03-28SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1654) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR62 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback