HI SCR63 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Fiscal Audit Of The Kahoolawe Rehabilitation Trust Fund.
Title
Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission; State Auditor; Fiscal Audit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Marumoto, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1796-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Yamane, Pine. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-20-12 3:25PM in conference room 329. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Re-referred to HAW, referral sheet 68 | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Friday, 04-20-12 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to HAW, LMG, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 703) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3427) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-12 9:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from HWN/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3055), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, Kidani, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Hee, Kahele. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-12 2:55PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to HWN/WLH, WAM. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Offered. |