HI SCR61 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR61
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Community Development Authority To Study Properties In Or Around Kakaako To Recommend Appropriate Sites For A New Fire Station And To Identify Existing Fire Stations That May Be Relocated Or Expanded To More Effectively Serve The Kakaako Community.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Community Development Authority To Study Properties In Or Around Kakaako To Recommend Appropriate Sites For A New Fire Station And To Identify Existing Fire Stations That May Be Relocated Or Expanded To More Effectively Serve The Kakaako Community.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2233) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Hashimoto. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 04-11-19 10:30AM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 600). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1820) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1555), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EET/PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR61 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
HCR161 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR161 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.