HI SCR58 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR58
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Sale Of A Lease Of Certain Submerged Lands At Kaneohe Bay, Kaneohe, Oahu, For Non-commercial Boat Pier Purposes, By Public Auction.
Title
Authorizing The Sale Of A Lease Of Certain Submerged Lands At Kaneohe Bay, Kaneohe, Oahu, For Non-commercial Boat Pier Purposes, By Public Auction.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1787), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 04-06-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 504) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1471) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-10-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR58 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR40 (Same As) 2021-03-10 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
SR40 (Same As) 2021-03-10 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.