HI SCR58 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR58

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Re-Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Board Of Education To Mandate Climate Change Curriculum In All Public Schools No Later Than School Year 2021-2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Board Of Education To Mandate Climate Change Curriculum In All Public Schools No Later Than School Year 2021-2022.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateRe-Referred to EDU.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to EDU/AEN.
2020-03-03SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR58 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Referred to EDU, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback