HI SCR58 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR58
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Re-Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Re-Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Education To Mandate Climate Change Curriculum In All Public Schools No Later Than School Year 2021-2022.
Title
Urging The Board Of Education To Mandate Climate Change Curriculum In All Public Schools No Later Than School Year 2021-2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EDU/AEN. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR58 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=58&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR58_.HTM |