HI SCR57 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR57
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Agriculture To Review Procedures Relating To Aquaculture Importation Permit Applications And To Submit A Report To The Legislature.
Title
Urging The Board Of Agriculture To Review Procedures Relating To Aquaculture Importation Permit Applications And To Submit A Report To The Legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 04-11-18 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 51 |
2018-03-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 458). |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-28-18. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3217) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 1:50PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR57 (Carry Over) 2017-03-02 - Referred to JDL.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=57&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR57_.HTM |