HI SCR57 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Establish A Working Group To Develop Recommendations Regarding The Administrative Placement Of The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts.
Title
DAGS; SFCA; Transfer; Working Group
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] |
Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 721). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-20-12 | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Re-referred to CUA, referral sheet 78 | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1). | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Reported from CUA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1789-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-04-19 | (H) The committees on CUA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Mizuno, Pine. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by CUA on Thursday, 04-19-12 1:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to CUA, FIN, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 701) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3394) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-12 9:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3107), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 03-21-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 03-19-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-12 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Offered. |