HI SCR56 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Education To Convene A School Impact Fee Review Task Force To Review The School Impact Fees Law, Including Enforcement Of Existing Law, And Make Any Recommendations To Address Current And Future Needs For The Development Of New Schools To Accommodate Projected Population Growth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Education To Convene A School Impact Fee Review Task Force To Review The School Impact Fees Law, Including Enforcement Of Existing Law, And Make Any Recommendations To Address Current And Future Needs For The Development Of New Schools To Accommodate Projected Population Growth.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from LHE/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2223), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-11HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2019-04-11HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, DeCoite, Johanson, Quinlan, Tokioka.
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-11-19 2:10PM in conference room 309.
2019-04-10HouseThe committee(s) on LHE/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-11-19 at 2:10PM.
2019-04-08HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LHE/HSG on Wednesday, 04-10-19 2:05PM in conference room 309.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to LHE/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 598).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1818) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1619), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback