HI SCR54 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR54
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Study To Assess The Impact Of Medical Bill Review Costs On The State's Workers' Compensation System.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Study To Assess The Impact Of Medical Bill Review Costs On The State's Workers' Compensation System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2034-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 04-13-18 4:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 506) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Adopted. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Waived referral to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from LBR/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3286), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR/CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR54 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to CPH/WAM.
HCR38 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR38 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.