HI SCR52 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR52
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State To Include In Its List Of First Responders A Network Of Organizations Contracted To Immediately Provide Food, Beverages, And Ice To Citizens During A Natural Disaster.
Title
Requesting The State To Include In Its List Of First Responders A Network Of Organizations Contracted To Immediately Provide Food, Beverages, And Ice To Citizens During A Natural Disaster.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2005-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-12 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 04-12-18 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 505). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3470) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3231), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR52 (Carry Over) 2017-02-21 - Referred to JDL/GVO, WAM.
HCR44 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR44 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=52&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR52_.HTM |