HI SCR51 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 66
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Approving The Fee Simple Sale Of 91-1072 Welowelo Street, Kapolei, Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approving The Fee Simple Sale Of 91-1072 Welowelo Street, Kapolei, Hawaii

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-12 (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 66
2010-04-08 (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 504) in amended form (SD 1).
2010-04-08 (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2010-04-07 (S) One Day Notice 04-08-10.
2010-04-07 (S) One Day Notice 04-08-10.
2010-04-07 (S) Waived referral to WAM.
2010-03-12 (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2010-03-12 (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2704), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2010-03-05 (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Bunda, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kokubun, Takamine, Hemmings.
2010-03-02 (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-05-10 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2010-01-29 (S) Referred to WTL, WAM.
2010-01-29 (S) Offered.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback