HI SCR49 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR49
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Transfer Management Of All Submerged Lands, The Boat Launch Ramp, And Any Related Boat Launch Ramp Facilities Located At The Wahiawa Freshwater State Recreation Area From The Division Of Aquatic Resources To The Division Of Boating And Ocean Recreation.
Title
Urging The Board Of Land And Natural Resources To Transfer Management Of All Submerged Lands, The Boat Launch Ramp, And Any Related Boat Launch Ramp Facilities Located At The Wahiawa Freshwater State Recreation Area From The Division Of Aquatic Resources To The Division Of Boating And Ocean Recreation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 833). |
2019-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-22 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). |
2019-04-22 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2295), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-18 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Yamashita, McDermott. |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-18-19 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2258), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 04-12-19 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 596) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1816) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1614), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR49 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Division of Aquatic Resources
Division of Boating and Ocean Recreation
Transfer
Wahiawa Freshwater State Recreation Area
Division of Boating and Ocean Recreation
Transfer
Wahiawa Freshwater State Recreation Area