HI SCR49 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ito, Rhoads excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ito, Rhoads excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Clean Up And Investigation Of Illegal Dumping And Illegal Structures At 1700 Laumaile Street In Kalihi And The Development And Implementation Of Measures To Prevent Illegal Dumping And Illegal Structures In The Area.
Title
Environment; Illegal Dumping; Waste Disposal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ito, Rhoads excused (3). |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1669), recommending referral to JUD. |
2015-04-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Yamane, Pouha. |
2015-04-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-16-15 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 49 |
2015-04-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 415) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-15. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported from ENE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1318) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-15 3:15PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to ENE/PSM. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |