HI SCR48 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Har, Oshiro, Souki, Ward excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-18 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Har, Oshiro, Souki, Ward excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Order That Whenever The Flag Of The United States Is Flown On A Permanent Flagpole In Front Of The State Capitol Building, The National League Of Families' Pow/mia Flag Shall Be Flown On The Same Halyard.
Title
State Capitol; POW/MIA Flag; Korean War; Vietnam War
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Har, Oshiro, Souki, Ward excused (5). |
2016-04-18 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1716-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-04-14 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Kawakami, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Choy, Kong, Ward. |
2016-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 04-14-16 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 47 |
2016-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 428). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3392) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, K.Kahele, Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 8:35AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDL. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from GVO/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3145), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-22-16 1:25PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-17-16 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 2:30PM in conference room 414. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Referred to GVO/PSM, JDL. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=48&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SCR48_.HTM |