HI SCR40 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-16 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EBM with none voting no and Har, Luke, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Souki excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-16 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EBM with none voting no and Har, Luke, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Souki excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing Support For Enforcement Of Existing Osha Regulations On The Use Of Hexavalent Chromium And Urging Osha To Develop Safer Alternatives And Ban Hexavalent Chromium.
Title
Hexavalent Chromium; Workplace Safety; OSHA Regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on EBM with none voting no and Har, Luke, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Souki excused. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1358-10), recommending referral to EBM. | |
2010-04-15 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Pine. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 04-15-10 4:45PM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Referred to LAB, EBM, referral sheet 60 | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 385) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) One Day Notice 04-01-10. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Reported from HTH/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2938) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Hemmings. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Bunda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Hee. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-10 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to HTH/LBR. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Offered. |