HI SCR35 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to EEP/HLT/PVM, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 49
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The United States Environmental Protection Agency And The Hawaii State Department Of Health To Reject The Approval Of A Single Wall Tank Upgrade Alternative Option For The Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility And The Conclusions Presented In The Groundwater Protection And Evaluations Considerations Report For The Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility Dated July 27, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The United States Environmental Protection Agency And The Hawaii State Department Of Health To Reject The Approval Of A Single Wall Tank Upgrade Alternative Option For The Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility And The Conclusions Presented In The Groundwater Protection And Evaluations Considerations Report For The Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility Dated July 27, 2018.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReferred to EEP/HLT/PVM, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 49
2019-04-01HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 543) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-01SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-29SenateOne Day Notice 04-01-19.
2019-03-29SenateReported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1661) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-12SenateRe-Referred to AEN/PSM.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to AEN/PSM, CPH.
2019-03-05SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback