HI SCR31 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Sunrise Review Of The Licensure And Regulation Of Herbal Therapists.
Title
Herbal Therapists; Sunrise Review; Auditor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 737). |
2014-04-29 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-29 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito, Takai excused (2). |
2014-04-25 | House | Deferred one day 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1697-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-17 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-04-17 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:35PM in conference room 308. |
2014-04-15 | House | Resolution scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:35PM in conference room 309. |
2014-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro, Wooley excused (3). |
2014-04-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1674-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-04-14 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, Oshiro, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen. |
2014-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 04-14-14 2:00PM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2014-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 445) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3262) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3091), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Offered. |