HI SCR29 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR29
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress To Amend Title 42 United States Code Section 16355 And Lift The Prohibition On The Establishment Of New National Laboratories.
Title
Urging Congress To Amend Title 42 United States Code Section 16355 And Lift The Prohibition On The Establishment Of New National Laboratories.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 556). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from PSM/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1684) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 2:55PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EET. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR29 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 50
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=29&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR29_.HTM |