HI SCR261 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Attorney General To Petition The Hawaii Supreme Court Seeking Relief To Prevent Action Against The Reapportionment Commission For The Commission's Failure To Meet Statutory Or Constitutional Deadlines Relating To The 2021 Reapportionment Plans.
Title
Requesting The Attorney General To Petition The Hawaii Supreme Court Seeking Relief To Prevent Action Against The Reapportionment Commission For The Commission's Failure To Meet Statutory Or Constitutional Deadlines Relating To The 2021 Reapportionment Plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1632), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-05 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Tokioka. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 04-05-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 601) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1463) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-21 10:00AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR220 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.