HI SCR253 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to PDP/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to PDP/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Department Of Defense To Report Current Coronavirus Disease 2019 Statistics In Order To Help Protect The Military And Local Communities In Which The Government And Military Installations Are Located.
Title
Urging The United States Department Of Defense To Report Current Coronavirus Disease 2019 Statistics In Order To Help Protect The Military And Local Communities In Which The Government And Military Installations Are Located.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to PDP/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 596) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1342) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 1:10PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR212 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.