HI SCR25 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR25
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing October 3 Through October 7, 2022, As Digital Inclusion Week In The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Recognizing October 3 Through October 7, 2022, As Digital Inclusion Week In The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 772). |
2022-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-25 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2149-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-21 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McKelvey, Ward. |
2022-04-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 04-21-22 1:30PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2030-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-04-13 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Woodson, Okimoto. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 04-13-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to HET, JHA, referral sheet 47 |
2022-04-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 667) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3812) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Keohokalole. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to LCA. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR25 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR19 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR19 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.