HI SCR25 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Police Departments Of Each County To Adopt New Fireworks Detection Technologies To Enforce Fireworks Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Police Departments Of Each County To Adopt New Fireworks Detection Technologies To Enforce Fireworks Laws.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1556), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to PSM, WAM.
2019-02-28SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback