HI SCR229 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR229
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Mandating Health Insurance Coverage For Annual Mental Health Wellness Examinations.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Mandating Health Insurance Coverage For Annual Mental Health Wellness Examinations.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 46 |
2022-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 657) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3691) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR229 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32