HI SCR229 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR229
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation And The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Develop Better Mission-driven Hiring And Training Of Culturally-accepted Interpreters Employed At Hawaii Health Systems Facilities And To Create Culturally-accepted Educational Materials On Preventative Care And Early Intervention To Assist Non-english Speaking Populations Seeking Care At Hawaii Health Systems Corporation Facilities.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation And The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Develop Better Mission-driven Hiring And Training Of Culturally-accepted Interpreters Employed At Hawaii Health Systems Facilities And To Create Culturally-accepted Educational Materials On Preventative Care And Early Intervention To Assist Non-english Speaking Populations Seeking Care At Hawaii Health Systems Corporation Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 582) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1475) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS will hold a public decision making on 03-30-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HMS. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR229 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 32
SR189 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR189 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Subjects
Hawaii Health Systems Corp.
Preventative Care and Early Intervention Education
Task Force
Training Interpreters
Preventative Care and Early Intervention Education
Task Force
Training Interpreters