HI SCR228 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR228
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 46
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 46
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Sunrise Analysis On Mandating Health Insurance Coverage For Annual Mental Health Screenings.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Sunrise Analysis On Mandating Health Insurance Coverage For Annual Mental Health Screenings.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 46 |
2022-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3690) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR228 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to HTH.