HI SCR223 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR223
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to HHH, referral sheet 45
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to HHH, referral sheet 45
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Human Services To Establish Or Contract With A Victim Service Provider To Operate And Maintain An Emergency Shelter For Children Who Are Survivors Of Sex Trafficking.
Title
Urging The Department Of Human Services To Establish Or Contract With A Victim Service Provider To Operate And Maintain An Emergency Shelter For Children Who Are Survivors Of Sex Trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to HHH, referral sheet 45 |
2022-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 643) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3630) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HMS. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR223 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 32
HCR137 (Same As) 2022-04-25 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 902) in amended form (SD 1).
SR216 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HCR137 (Same As) 2022-04-25 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 902) in amended form (SD 1).
SR216 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.