HI SCR212 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to TRN/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The President Of The Senate And Speaker Of The House Of Representatives To Convene A Joint Legislative Task Force To Determine Design Solutions And Safety Features To Enhance Pedestrian Safety On State And County Roads.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The President Of The Senate And Speaker Of The House Of Representatives To Convene A Joint Legislative Task Force To Determine Design Solutions And Safety Features To Enhance Pedestrian Safety On State And County Roads.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReferred to TRN/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 645).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from PSM/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1806) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to PSM/TRS.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback