HI SCR212 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR212
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to TRN/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to TRN/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The President Of The Senate And Speaker Of The House Of Representatives To Convene A Joint Legislative Task Force To Determine Design Solutions And Safety Features To Enhance Pedestrian Safety On State And County Roads.
Title
Requesting The President Of The Senate And Speaker Of The House Of Representatives To Convene A Joint Legislative Task Force To Determine Design Solutions And Safety Features To Enhance Pedestrian Safety On State And County Roads.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to TRN/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 645). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1806) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRS. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR212 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to TRN/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 50
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=212&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR212_.HTM |